+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Denney (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 28, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 7