+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/19/2014
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Griffin, Schulz, Dahm, Treat, Sparks, Ellis
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 19
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 54 Nays: 7
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 49
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Russ
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Sparks
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Russ (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
February 24, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3