+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 31
- General Order
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
February 18, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor