+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5
- General Order
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
- Title restored
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Biggs (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 2, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor