+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 5
- General Order
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary - Civil
- Withdrawn from Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Rosino
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 21, 2022: Senate Contracts. Effective Date.
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor