+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Shaw
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Stark, Steagall, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Smith, Grego, Patzkowsky, Roberts (Sean), Taylor
- General Order
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Public Health, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- Referred for engrossment
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Pederson
- Coauthored by Senator Howard
- Coauthored by Senator Daniels
- Coauthored by Senator Rader
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Scott
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Olsen
- Coauthored by Senator Boggs
- Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Bullard
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor