+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Fields
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sparks
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 13, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 5