+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/08/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Coauthored by Bennett
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Casey (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Ford
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 6
March 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
March 6, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6