+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remove as principal author Representative Moore and substitute with Representative Newton
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCs named Jech, Leewright, Taylor, Paxton, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
- Third Reading vote rescinded
- Recalled from engrossment
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 1
- General Order
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
- Title restored
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Jech
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
March 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor