+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- To Senate
- Veto overridden: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
- Veto override message received
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Measure sent to House
- Veto overridden: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed 04/26/2022
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Floyd
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Kirt
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Murdock
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 8, 2022: Senate Date.
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor