+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Rader
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 24, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47