+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
March 8, 2022: Senate Credit Allocation Limit. Effective Date.
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor