+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
- Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 24
- Amendment #2 adopted upon roll call vote 38-7
- Amendment #1 adopted-voice vote
- General Order, Amended
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Simpson
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Jett
- Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
- Coauthored by Senator Daniels
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2022: Senate Amendment
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
March 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 2