+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught
- General Order
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Vaughan (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 13, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 6