+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Miller
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Stinson
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez
- Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading