+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Shaw
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3