+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming GCCA
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCs named GCCA
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 3
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
- General Order
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Hall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
April 4, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 9, 2022: Senate Of Fees. Emergency.]
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4