+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
- JCR adopted
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Casey
- Coauthored by Sears (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Treat
- Authored by Senator Jolley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
May 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
May 24, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 4