+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3
- General Order
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Howard
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
March 15, 2022: Senate Care. Emergency.
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor