+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- JCR adopted
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency removed
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
- Coauthored by Senator Fields
- Authored by Senator David
- Coauthored by Representative Casey
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor