+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2014
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Shortey
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Hardin (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor