+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
- Coauthored by Senator Simpson
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Murdock
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ortega (principal House author)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Schulz
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 6
April 10, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
March 14, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor