+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Authored by Senator Allen
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor