+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
- General Order, Considered
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Griffin
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor