+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Referred to Appropriations
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Emergency clause stricken
- Enacting clause stricken
- Emergency added
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Newberry
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor