+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency added
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leewright
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor