+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Peterson (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Crain
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
February 25, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor