+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
- General Order
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor