+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/18/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 13
- General Order
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Select Agencies sub-committee
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appr/Sub-Select Agencies
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Thompson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
March 7, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor