+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sparks
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
March 8, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor