+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- General Order
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
- Emergency clause restored
- Referred for engrossment
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Pittman
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Loveless
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 9
April 17, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
April 10, 2017: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 10