+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Floyd
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3