+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Common Education, Direct to Calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7