+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
- General Order
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee sub-committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Hardin (principal House author)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Simpson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 13, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 8