+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/04/2022
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Sent to Governor
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 5
- General Order
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Title restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Rosino
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 25
March 14, 2022: Senate Effective Date.
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor