+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Dahm
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 12, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4