+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Haste
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2