+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2014
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Motion to reconsider tabled
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hall
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 27
- General Order
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Judiciary Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Hall (principal House author)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Holt
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor