+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
- Backed up to General Order
- Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Holt
- Measure failed: Ayes: 0 Nays: 44
- General Order, Considered
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Holt
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2014: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor