+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed 05/15/2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- HAs adopted
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Sykes
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 14
- Motion to suspend rule failed
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Tadlock, Meredith
- General Order
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Title restored
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Senator Fields
- Remove as author Senator Sykes; authored by Senator David
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Downing (principal House author)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Sykes
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 5
April 11, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 6
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 14