+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
- General Order
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Rader
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
March 29, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor