+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in conference
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCs named Pugh, Leewright, Bice, Stanislawski, Kidd, Pittman, Brooks
- HAs rejected, conference requested
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 24
- General Order
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Government Modernization Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pugh
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor