+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Pederson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor