+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Allen
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Jech
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator McCortney
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 2, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor