+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Utilities
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8
- General Order, Considered
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brumbaugh (principal House author)
- Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Newberry
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Treat
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 10, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor