+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Enacting clause stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Health Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Kidd
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor