+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, to House
- Referred for enrollment
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Signed, returned to Senate
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
- General Order
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency clause restored
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Bice
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2