+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Ortega (principal House author)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Howard
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 2