+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- HAs read
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 19
- General Order
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Derby (principal House author)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Yen
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
March 13, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor