+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading, direct to Calendar
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19
- Title stricken
- General Order, Amended
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bush
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author)
- Authored by Senator Montgomery
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor